EP1715248 - Holding element and heatshield member for a heatshield and combustion chamber including said heatshield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Marcus Fockenbachstrasse 32 56589 Niederbreitbach / DE | 02 /
Tertilt, Marc Balkhauser Weg 53 45529 Hattingen / DE | 03 /
Vonnemann, Bernd Haverkampstrasse 17 45968 Gladbeck / DE | [2006/43] | Application number, filing date | 05008510.9 | 19.04.2005 | [2006/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1715248 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F23M5/04 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
F23R3/007 (EP,US);
F23M5/04 (EP,US);
F27D1/0033 (EP,US);
F27D1/14 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0517 (EP,US);
F23M2900/05002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/27] |
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halteelement und Hitzeschildelement für einen Hitzeschild sowie mit einem Hitzeschild versehene Brennkammer | [2006/43] | English: | Holding element and heatshield member for a heatshield and combustion chamber including said heatshield | [2006/43] | French: | Élément de fixation et portion correspondante d'un bouclier thermique ainsi que chambre de combustion munie d'un tel bouclier | [2006/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.06.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8908264U (POSCH, HERIBERT, 8151 WALL, DE) [X] 9,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4114768 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 27 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2685035 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1,9 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [DYA]EP0558540 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DY] 13 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 56 * [A] 1,9; | [X]US5363620 (LIU HAN-DU [TW]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 50 - line 66 * * figures 2-6 * * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 2, line 50 - line 66 *; | [XY]US5899151 (MERKLE JR FRANK P [US]) [X] 1-12 * figures 4-6 * * column 4, line 1 - line 30 * [Y] 13; | [A]US2003177770 (HOFMANN DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 14,16 * paragraphs [0053] , [0066]; figures 1,11 *; | [E]EP1561997 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [E] 1,2,4* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0054] * |