EP1589441 - Mobile communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Shin, NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Ando, Manabu, NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Matsuda, Hironori, NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008679.2 | 20.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | JP20040127162 | 22.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004127162 | JP20050095579 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005095579 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1589441 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
G06F16/9537 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/27] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles Kommunikationsgerät | [2005/43] | English: | Mobile communication terminal | [2005/43] | French: | Terminal de communication mobile | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 13.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002092236 ; | [X]US6603977 (WALSH PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 8, line 17 - column 18, line 55 *; | [X] - BIEBER G ET AL, "Personal mobile navigation systems-design considerations and experiences", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, (200108), vol. 25, no. 4, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 563 - 570, XP004296033 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0097-8493(01)00084-X | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002092236 A 20020329 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |