EP1591477 - Peroxyde curable butyl formulations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lanxess Inc. Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Resendes, Rui 338 Brentwood Cres. Corunna Ontario, N0N 1G0 / CA | 02 /
Gronowski, Adam 1236 Wiltshire Drive Sarnia Ontario, N7S 3W2 / CA | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Deblon, Jörg-Stephan, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LEX-IPR Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Deblon, Jörg-Stephan, et al Lanxess Deutschland GmbH LIP-IPR, Geb. Q 18. 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Zobel, Manfred LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Zobel, Manfred LANXESS Deutschland GmbH, LIP-IPR Building Q 18 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008731.1 | 21.04.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | CA20042465407 | 28.04.2004 Original published format: CA 2465407 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591477 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/14, C08F210/12 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
C08K5/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/14, C08L23/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Title | German: | Peroxidhärtbare Butylzusammensetzungen | [2005/44] | English: | Peroxyde curable butyl formulations | [2005/44] | French: | Compositions butyliques réticulables à l'aide de peroxydes | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3042662 (COTTLE DELMER L, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 44 - line 71; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]EP0323569 (POLYSAR LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-11 * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0474406 (DAIKYO GOMU SEIKO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, line 6 - line 26 * * page 32, line 34 - line 38; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5824717 (MERRILL NATALIE ANN [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [DY]EP0828761 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0121672 (BAYER INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, line 29 - page 3 * * page 4, line 24 - line 27; claims 1-30 *; | [X]WO03050171 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 8 - page 8, line 7 * * page 18, line 14 - line 23 * * page 27, line 1 - line 5; claims 1-83 *; | [PX]EP1506978 (BAYER INC [CA]) [PX] 1-11* the whole document * |