EP1591038 - Telescopic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X2 Technology i Växjö AB Hammerdalsvägen 3 352 46 Växjö / SE | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bondesen, Ole Langbrogade 9, 2 sal 6400 Sönderborg / DK | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Per-Olof, et al AWAPATENT AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Andersson, Per-Olof, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 05008874.9 | 22.04.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | SE20040001060 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: SE 0401060 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591038 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47B9/04 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A47B9/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/27] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Teleskopische Vorrichtung | [2005/44] | English: | Telescopic device | [2005/44] | French: | Dispositif télescopique | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.06.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5937699 (GARREC PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 33; figures 1-5 *[A] 4; | [X]DE20301963U (SUSPA HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 9 - page 14, line 24; figures 1-10 *; | [XA]WO03082727 (EUROPOINT S N C [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 3, line 14 - page 7, line 31; figures 1-8 * [A] 4 |