EP1679439 - Apparatus and method for controlling a compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2010/24] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Chel-Woong Sindaebang Apt. 101-709, 705, Sindaebang-Dong Dongjak-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Chang-Oh 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008974.7 | 23.04.2005 | [2006/28] | Priority number, date | KR20050001754 | 07.01.2005 Original published format: KR 2005001754 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1679439 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1679439 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1679439 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/06, F04B35/04 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
F04B35/045 (EP,KR,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,KR,US);
H02P25/032 (KR);
F04B2201/0206 (EP,KR,US);
F04B2203/0401 (EP,KR,US);
F04B2203/0402 (EP,KR,US);
F04B2207/01 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/14] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Kompressorregelung | [2006/28] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling a compressor | [2006/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande d'un compresseur | [2006/28] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 26.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003209015 (SONG GYE-YOUNG [KR]); | [A]US2004042904 (KIM GYEONG-DON [KR]); | [A]US2004080287 (PARK KYEONG-BAE [KR]) |