EP1601202 - Image transmission apparatus using information on rendered range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Display Solutions, Ltd. 13-23, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/24] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states NEC Viewtechnology, Ltd. 37-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Eisaku NEC Viewtechnology, Ltd. 37-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009042.2 | 25.04.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | JP20040157897 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004157897 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601202 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1601202 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/36 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
H04N19/507 (EP,US);
H04N19/20 (EP,US);
H04N19/423 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/48] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/24] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildübertragungsvorrichtung mit Information über einen dargestellten Bereich | [2005/48] | English: | Image transmission apparatus using information on rendered range | [2005/48] | French: | Appareil de transmission d'images avec information sur une région rendue | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 07.04.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2299233 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 30 * * page 15, line 30 - page 17, line 23 * * tables 1-4 * * figures 3,6-8 *; | [I]EP1168154 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [I] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0010] , [0017] , [0026] - [0029] * * figures 1,2A,2B,2C *; | [A]US2002159517 (OKAMOTO KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0202] - [0208] ** figures 10-12 * |