Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
04.07.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
04.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
04.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
28.03.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.01.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.06.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
20.04.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.03.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
09.02.2007 | First examination report | |
08.02.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.01.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |
23.06.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
23.06.2006 | Change - classification | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
16.09.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |