EP1600891 - Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure, Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Aloka Co. Ltd. 6-22-1 Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo, 181-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murashita, Masaru c/o Aloka Co., Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi, Tokyo, 181-8622 / JP | 02 /
Hirota, Koji c/o Aloka Co., Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi, Tokyo, 181-8622 / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009137.0 | 26.04.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | JP20040157491 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004157491 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600891 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, A61B8/14, A61B8/08, G01S7/52 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
A61B6/469 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/14 (EP,US);
A61B8/466 (EP,US);
A61B8/467 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/31] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ultraschalldiagnosevorrichtung und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren | [2005/48] | English: | Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus and image processing method | [2005/48] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic à ultra-sons et procédé de traitement d'images | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 01.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002102023 (YAMAUCHI MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0124] *[A] 3-18; | [XA]US2003174890 (YAMAUCHI MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * First Embodiment * [A] 3-18 |