EP1726443 - Method and apparatus for marking the sides of a plane workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Homag Holzbearbeitungssysteme AG Homagstrasse 3-5 72296 Schopfloch / DE | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalmbach, Kurt Tannenweg 1 72275 Alpirsbach / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Johannes Weinbergstr. 24 72181 Starzach Wachendorf / DE | 03 /
Frey, Karl Goethestr. 19 72296 Schopfloch / DE | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009326.9 | 28.04.2005 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726443 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726443 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B41J11/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B41J3/4073 (EP,US);
B27D5/003 (EP);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41J11/0095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bemustern der Schmalseiten von plattenförmigen Werkstücken | [2006/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for marking the sides of a plane workpiece | [2006/48] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour marquer les côtés d'une pièce detacheée plane | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 16.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | GB | 13.06.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | LT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | IS | 13.10.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | CY | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | SI | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036296 (PRINTOS BV [NL]) [A] 1,3,17 * page 11, line 22 - page 12; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1063096 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,17 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] ** claim 1 *; | [A]EP1145859 (COMITAL S P A [IT]) [A] 1,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US2004028830 (BAUER JORG R [DE]) [DA] 1-17 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048]; figures 3,4 *; | [DA]DE202004000662U (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [DA] 1-17 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011]; figure .; claims 1,3,4 * |