Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
13.10.2006 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
19.09.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
19.09.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
08.09.2006 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
29.06.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.05.2006 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.05.2006 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
04.03.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.03.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] |
10.02.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
10.02.2006 | Change - applicant | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
21.10.2005 | Change - representative | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
30.09.2005 | Change - applicant | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
30.09.2005 | Change - inventor | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
10.06.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
11.05.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |