Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004500933 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | DE0102271 | 20.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1292344 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2005 | B8 | EP1292344 | 10.08.2005 | B1 | EP1292344 | 19.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | DE0102271 | 20.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7627101 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | DE0102271 | 20.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1557190 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2006 | B1 | EP1557190 | 27.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01953796 | 20.06.2001 | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE301485T | 15.08.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | DE0102271 | 20.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50107056D1 | 15.09.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50107056 | 20.06.2001 | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | DE0102271 | 20.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50111473D1 | 28.12.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | DE50111473 | 20.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7160265 | 09.01.2007 | B2 | US2004049151 | 11.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | DE0102271 | 20.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0197880 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2002 | A3 | WO0197880 | 27.12.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE345151T | 15.12.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10029325 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10029325 | 20.06.2000 | Type | Earlier application | EP1292344 |