EP1720387 - High current terminal with press fit portion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broch, Franz Via Schivardi 96a 25123 Brescia / IT | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/45] | Application number, filing date | 05009661.9 | 03.05.2005 | [2006/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720387 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/30, H01R12/34 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H01R12/58 (EP);
H05K3/308 (EP);
H01R4/02 (EP);
H05K2201/0373 (EP);
H05K2201/09854 (EP);
H05K2201/1059 (EP);
H05K2201/1081 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/28] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochstromkontakt in massiver Einpresstechnik | [2006/45] | English: | High current terminal with press fit portion | [2006/45] | French: | Contact à haut courant avec une portion de serrage | [2006/45] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.06.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2914745 (KROL STANLEY J, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 34 - line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE3244628 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE8605937U (KALLEE, WERNER, 7121 CLEEBRONN, DE) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE4034789 (C.A. WEIDMUELLER GMBH & CO, 4930 DETMOLD, DE) [X] 1,4 * abstract *; | [X]DE29613231U (BEISNER MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1 * page 1; figures 5-8; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2326771 (KAM CIRCUITS LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10021635 (HOLZSCHUH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * figures 2,3,5 *; | [X]US2002047504 (TAKAHASHI HIDEYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 3-5 *; | [X]US2002146921 (LU QUN [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2A-2H *; | [A]DE202004001432U (ECI TELECOM LTD [IL]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * |