EP1593644 - Industrial truck with a piston-cylinder arrangement and an improved cylinder bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Am Stadtrand 35 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2013/25] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schönauer, Michael Westerbergstrasse 8c 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009845.8 | 04.05.2005 | [2005/45] | Priority number, date | DE20041022338 | 06.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004022338 | [2005/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1593644 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1593644 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593644 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/08, B66F9/22 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
B66F9/22 (EP,US);
B66F9/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | B66F9/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2012/20] |
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flurförderzeug mit Kolben-Zylinder-Anordnung und verbesserter Zylinderlagerung | [2005/45] | English: | Industrial truck with a piston-cylinder arrangement and an improved cylinder bearing | [2005/45] | French: | Chariot de manutention avec un agencement piston-cylindre et un palier de cylindre amélioré | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 13.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.06.2013 | [2014/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1556601 (LINDE AG) [X] 1,3-11,14-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO8102290 (TOWMOTOR CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 20 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 21 * * figures 2,3 * [I] 14-16; | [X]EP0899232 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,11,14-16 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] * * figures 19,20 *; | [A]US5934171 (THOMPSON PAUL S [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 8 ** figures 2,4,5 * |