blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1600247

EP1600247 - Nozzle checker for laser beam machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/48]Noozle checker for laser beam machine
[2012/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamazaki Mazak Corporation
1 Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun
Aichi pref. / JP
[2012/28]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORPORATION
1 Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun
Aichi pref. / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamazaki, Tsunehiko c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corporation
1, Norifune, Oguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi pref. / JP
02 / Miyakawa, Naoomi c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corporation
1, Norifune, Oguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi pref. / JP
 [2005/48]
Representative(s)Steinmeister, Helmut
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/28]Steinmeister, Helmut
Patentanwälte TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2005/48]Steinmeister, Helmut
Patentanwälte TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date05009904.306.05.2005
[2005/48]
Priority number, dateJP2004015593026.05.2004         Original published format: JP 2004155930
[2005/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1600247
Date:30.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1600247
Date:01.10.2008
[2008/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1600247
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2008
ClassificationIPC:B23K26/42, B23K26/08
[2008/40]
CPC:
B23K26/1494 (EP,US); B23K26/043 (EP); B23K26/0884 (EP,US);
B23K26/1482 (EP,US); B23K26/702 (EP,US); G01N21/94 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2005/48]B23K26/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/24]
Former [2005/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Düsenprüfer für eine Laserstrahlmaschine[2005/48]
English:Nozzle checker for laser beam machine[2012/08]
French:Contrôleur de buse pour une machine à faisceau laser[2005/48]
Former [2005/48]Noozle checker for laser beam machine
Examination procedure28.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/12]
24.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.05.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
20.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2012Fee for grant paid
23.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2009
Opposition(s)12.04.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPH10258376  (AMADA CO LTD) [AD] 1,3* abstract *;
 [A]US5854460  (GRAF RAYMOND J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1211015  (MESSER CUTTING & WELDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1250975  (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1211015
 JP2004155930
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.