EP1609843 - Demulsifiers for blends of middle distillates, fuel oils of vegetable or animal origin and water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siggelkow, Bettina, Dr. Brüderstrasse 20 46145 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Leinweber, Dirk, Dr. Sossenheimer Weg 24 65824 Schwalbach / DE | 03 /
Reimann, Werner, Dr. Loreleistrasse 28 65929 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
Neuhaus, UIrike Ferdinandstrasse 81 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 05 /
Braun, Renate Oststrasse 92a 46539 Dinslaken / DE | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/52] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009924.1 | 06.05.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | DE20041024532 | 18.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004024532 | [2005/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1609843 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1609843 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22, C10L1/14, B01D17/05 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/2225 (EP,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,US);
C10L1/1641 (EP,US);
C10L1/19 (EP,US);
C10L1/191 (EP,US);
C10L1/195 (EP,US);
C10L1/1966 (EP,US);
C10L1/1973 (EP,US);
C10L1/1981 (EP,US);
C10L1/1985 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/2364 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (EP,US);
C10L1/2387 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/52] | C10L1/22, C10L1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Demulgatoren für Mischungen aus Mitteldestillaten mit Brennstoffölen pflanzlichen oder tierischen Ursprungs und Wasser | [2005/52] | English: | Demulsifiers for blends of middle distillates, fuel oils of vegetable or animal origin and water | [2005/52] | French: | Désémulsifiants pour mélanges de distillats moyens, d'huiles combustibles d'origine végétale ou animale et d'eau | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3344083 (DICKSON WOODROW J, et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 34 - line 49 * * column 9, line 60 - column 13, line 32 * * example - *; | [Y]EP0541018 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 19 - line 25 * * page 2, line 46 - line 53 * * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9318115 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9419430 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 3, line 9 - page 6, line 6 * * claims 1,4,12-15 *; | [Y]WO9533018 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 8 - line 12 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 12 * * page 7, line 11 - line 13 * * example - *; | [A]EP0857776 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13* the whole document * |