EP1722121 - Hydraulic double clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoerbiger Antriebstechnik GmbH Bernbeurener Strasse 13a 86956 Schongau / DE | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Maziere, Filip Bommelsrede 38B B-9070 Heusden-Destelbergen / BE | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010078.3 | 09.05.2005 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722121 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/02, F16D25/12, F16H61/00 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
F16H61/0031 (EP,US);
F16D25/14 (KR);
F16D25/12 (KR);
F16D25/123 (EP,US);
F16D48/0206 (EP,US);
F16H61/00 (KR);
F16D2048/0239 (EP,US);
F16D2048/0281 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3024 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulische Doppelkupplung | [2006/46] | English: | Hydraulic double clutch | [2006/46] | French: | Embrayage double hydraulique | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0316869 (HINO MOTORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 3-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, line 45 - line 48 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6386170 (IWANO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 12 ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2003158010 (FIDELER WINFRIED [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0013] - [0017] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1469235 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013] , [0016] , [0030] , [0034] * * figure 1 * [Y] 3-7; | [X]WO2004092618 (NSK LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 3 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1195537 |