EP1724440 - Process for optimizing the flow in multistage turbomachines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiala, Andreas, Dr. Ganghoferstr. 35a 80339 München / DE | [2006/47] | Application number, filing date | 05010100.5 | 10.05.2005 | [2006/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724440 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724440 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F01D5/142 (EP,US);
F05D2270/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/30] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Strömungsoptimierung in mehrstufigen Turbomaschinen | [2006/47] | English: | Process for optimizing the flow in multistage turbomachines | [2006/47] | French: | Procédé pour optimiser l'écoulement dans des turbomachines multi-étages | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 30.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS54114618 ; | [DX]EP0756667 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [DX] 1-6,9 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP1201877 (FIATAVIO SPA [IT]) [DX] 1,4-6,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1201880 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4-6,9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10237341 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,9 * paragraph [05.2]; figure 6 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791114), vol. 003, no. 137, Database accession no. (M - 080), & JP54114618 A 19790906 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,4-6,9 * abstract * | [A] - HUMMEL F, "WAKE-WAKE INTERACTIONS AND ITS POTENTIAL FOR CLOCKING IN A TRANSONIC HIGH PRESSURE TURBINE", ASME PAPER, XX, XX, (2001), no. 2001-GT-302, pages 1 - 9, XP009053708 [A] 4-6,9 |