blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1595626

EP1595626 - Pillar drill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phoenix Handelsmarketing GmbH & Co. KG
Erdinger Strasse 14
85609 Aschheim / DE
[2006/28]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
Rotwerk Elektrowerkzeuge und Handelsmarketing Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH
Erdinger Strasse 14
85609 Aschheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dallinger, Peter c/o Rotwerk Elektrowerkzeuge und
Handelsmarketing Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH
Erdinger Strasse 14 85609 Aschheim / DE
 [2006/09]
Former [2005/52]01 / Dallinger, Peter
Erdinger Strasse 14
D-85609 Aschheim / DE
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05010142.710.05.2005
[2005/46]
Priority number, dateDE20042007618U12.05.2004         Original published format: DE 202004007618 U
[2005/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1595626
Date:16.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1595626
Date:28.10.2009
[2009/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2009
ClassificationIPC:B23B39/00, B23Q1/00, B23Q5/14
[2005/46]
CPC:
B23B39/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/46]
TitleGerman:Säulenbohrmaschine[2005/46]
English:Pillar drill[2005/46]
French:Perceuse sur colonne[2005/46]
Examination procedure28.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/23]
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/21]
09.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201208   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2012
31.05.201309   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US1992311  (HENRY SUNDERMANN H, et al) [A] 2 * page 3, column R, line 36 - line 39 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]FR910263  (CHARRAS MARC) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 3, line 27 - line 36 * * figures 1,9 *;
 [A]DE945359  (GROSSDREHMASCHB 8 MAI VEB) [A] 4* figure - *;
 [Y]US2893271  (ELLEDGE MARTIN D) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 10 - line 13 * * figures 1-3,10 *;
 [A]DE976137  (OTTO MUELLER MASCHF) [A] 2 * page 2, line 55 - line 57 * * figure - *;
 [A]US3837757  (LEVINE A) [A] 1,3-8 * column 2, line 6 - line 8 * * column 2, line 36 - line 57 * * figure - *;
 [XY]DE3307804  (LIN SHYI HUNG [US]) [X] 1,3-8 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line L * * figure - * [Y] 2;
 [Y]DE4232076  (JANG KWAN SOON [KR]) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 27 - line 34 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5415503  (STRANGE ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 42 - line 44 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 4 * * figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.