EP1600808 - Illumination system with a flat lamp in a case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hitzschke, Lothar, Dr. Theodor-Alt-Strasse 6 81737 München / DE | 02 /
Vollkomer, Frank, Dr. Neurieder Strasse 18 82131 Buchendorf / DE | [2005/48] | Application number, filing date | 05010156.7 | 10.05.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | DE20041025266 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025266 | [2005/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600808 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600808 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, H01J61/30 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G02F1/133604 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU, NL [2006/31] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungssystem mit einem Gehäuse und einer darin angeordneten Flachlampe | [2005/48] | English: | Illumination system with a flat lamp in a case | [2005/48] | French: | Système d'illumination avec une lampe plate dans une boîte | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5994849 (VOLLKOMMER FRANK [DE], et al) [YD] 11,12 * figure 6A *; | [AD]US6034470 (VOLLKOMMER FRANK [DE], et al) [AD] 1,10,15* the whole document *; | [XY]US2002063514 (OISHI TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12; | [XY]US2002154258 (FUJISHIRO FUMIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0084] - [0092] - [0098]; figures 4-6 * [Y] 11,12; | [AD]WO03017312 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE], et al) [AD] 10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004046490 (DOLL GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0021]; figures 1A,1B * |