EP1721720 - Method for preparing formed polyurethane foam materials and formed polyurethane foam materials therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jung-Shun, Ou No. 385 Sec.3, Shishen Rd. Chiayi / TW | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010158.3 | 10.05.2005 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721720 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/56 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
B29C44/569 (EP);
B29C44/5627 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyurethanschaumformteilen und so geformte Polyurethanschaumformteilen | [2006/46] | English: | Method for preparing formed polyurethane foam materials and formed polyurethane foam materials therefrom | [2006/46] | French: | Méthode pour la préparation de pièces moulées en mousse de polyuréthane et pièces ainsi moulées | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003103548 ; | JP2003103548 [ ]; | [X]GB1375286 (KOEPP AG) [X] 1,8-10,24-26 * page 2, line 86 - line 90 * * page 3, line 12 - line 17 *; | [A]US5512233 (GALLAGHER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * column 5, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US6322743 (STROOBANTS JAN MAURICE [BE]) [A] 1-5,17-21 * column 2, paragraph L - column 3, paragraph 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030806), vol. 2003, no. 08, & JP2003103548 A 20030409 (INOAC CORP) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 79, Database accession no. 2003-847240, & JP2003103548 A 20030409 (INOAC CORP KK) [ ] * abstract * |