EP1598880 - Method of manufacturing of an OLED display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kateeva, Inc. 7015 Gateway Boulevard Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Hideyuki Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Seki, Shunichi Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Naoki Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2020/01] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
Kimura, Hideyuki Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Seki, Shunichi Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamamoto, Naoki Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010239.1 | 11.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040149168 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004149168 | JP20050095183 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005095183 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598880 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598880 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598880 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/56, // H01L27/32 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H10K59/35 (EP,US);
F25D31/002 (KR);
H10K71/135 (EP,US);
B67D1/0042 (KR);
H10K71/70 (EP);
B67D2001/0095 (KR);
H01L21/67155 (EP,US);
H01L27/1214 (EP,US);
H10K2102/3026 (EP,US);
H10K50/841 (US);
H10K59/12 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/871 (EP,KR);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K71/15 (EP,US);
H10K71/441 (EP,US);
H10K77/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | H01L51/40, H01L27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/01] |
Former [2010/27] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsmethode eines OLED-Displays | [2005/47] | English: | Method of manufacturing of an OLED display | [2005/47] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un panneau d'affichage organique électroluminescent | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | [2021/23] |
Former [2021/22] | GB | 11.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0117040 (E INK CORP [US]); | [X]WO0147044 (PLASTIC LOGIC LTD [GB], et al); | [A]GB2360489 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [X]EP1209744 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [PX]WO2004070810 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2002252083 |