EP1722488 - SHDSL data transmission line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245 8047 Zürich / CH | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freudenmann, Robert Bahnhofstrasse 27 8854 Siebnen / CH | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Kley, Hansjörg Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Kley, Hansjörg c/o Siemens AG Patentabteilung Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010455.3 | 13.05.2005 | [2006/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722488 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/32 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
H04L5/16 (EP);
H04B3/32 (EP);
H04M11/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SHDSL-Übertragungsstrecke | [2006/46] | English: | SHDSL data transmission line | [2006/46] | French: | Ligne de transmission de données SHDSL | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/05] | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.06.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0719006 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-5* column 7, line 55 - column 9, line 5; figure 4 * |