EP1721595 - Container for providing medical fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Avitum AG Werk Glandorf Postfach 11 80 49215 Glandorf / DE | [2021/32] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states B. Braun Avitum AG Werk Glandorf Postfach 11 80 49215 Glandorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states B. Braun Medizintechnologie GmbH Schwarzenberger Weg 73-79 34212 Melsungen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wesseler, Matthias Stelling 4a Melle / DE | 02 /
Renken, Martin, Dr. Oderstrasse 48 48145 Münster / DE | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/32] |
Former [2013/12] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Zumstein & Klingseisen Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010458.7 | 13.05.2005 | [2006/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721595 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1721595 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1721595 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/05 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A61J1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/32] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behälter für die Bereitstellung medizinischer Flüssigkeiten | [2006/46] | English: | Container for providing medical fluids | [2006/46] | French: | Récipient pour délivrer des liquides médicaux | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2014/20] | 15.05.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.10.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.07.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 06.11.2015 | Appeal received No. T2108/15 | 18.01.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 21.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2005 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | AT | 13.05.2014 | IE | 13.05.2014 | LU | 13.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/25] | BG | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
AT | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
LU | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
AT | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
LU | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
LU | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2003325675 ; | [XY]US4516977 (HERBERT REINHOLD [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figures 6,7 * [Y] 3; | [X]EP1084691 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0037] , [0040] ** figures 2,3 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003325675 A 20031118 (FUKAI KOGYO KK) [Y] 3 * abstract * * figures 1,3-5,12 * [A] 1 | by applicant | US4516977 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2003, no. 12, page 5 | Opposition | US5509433 | DE19728775 | DE10030474 | US2003233083 | WO2005037362 |