EP1577669 - Improved electrochemical biosensor test strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics Operations, Inc. 9115 Hague Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46250 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics Corporation 9115 Hague Road, P.O. Box 50528 Indianapolis, IN 46250-0528 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crismore, William 468 Spring Beach Rome City, IN 46784 / US | 02 /
Surridge, Nigel 857 Nevelle Lane Carmel IN 46032 / US | 03 /
McMinn, Daniel 11795 Windcreek Overlook Alpharetta GA 30005 / US | 04 /
Diebold, Eric 8765 Providence Drive Nobelsville, IN 46060 / US | 05 /
Delk, Dale R. 9109 W. Sutherland Ave Yorktown IN 47396 / US | 06 /
Ho, Jiaxiong Jason 5275 Ivy Hill Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 07 /
Earl, Robert 12598 Spring Violet Place Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 08 /
Heald, Brian 14754 Clarinda Ct. Fortville IN 46040 / US | 09 /
Bodensteiner, Richard 25 River Road North Haven, CT 06473 / US | 10 /
Burke, David 8951 Riverbend Court Indianapolis IN 46250 / US | [2005/50] |
Former [2005/48] | 01 /
Crismore, William 468 Spring Beach Rome City, IN 46784 / US | ||
02 /
Surridge, Nigel 1248 E. 90th St. Indianapolis, IN 46240 / US | |||
03 /
McMinn, Daniel 1005 Barrington Oaks Place Roswell, GA 30075 / US | |||
04 /
Diebold, Eric 8765 Providence Drive Nobelsville, IN 46060 / US | |||
05 /
Dale Delk, R. 1605 S. Stockport Drive Muncie, IN 47304 / US | |||
06 /
Ho, Jiaxiong Jason 5275 Ivy Hill Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
07 /
Earl, Robert 12598 Spring Violet Place Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
08 /
Heald, Brian 10337 Seagrave Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | |||
09 /
Bodensteiner, Richard 25 River Road North Haven, CT 06473 / US | |||
10 /
Burke, David 8951 Riverbend Court Indianapolis IN 46250 / US | |||
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
Crismore, William 468 Spring Beach Rome City, IN 46784 / US | ||
02 /
Surridge, Nigel 1248 E. 90th St. Indianapolis, IN 46240 / US | |||
03 /
McMinn, Daniel 1005 Barrington Oaks Place Roswell, GA 30075 / US | |||
04 /
Diebold, Eric 8765 Providence Drive Nobelsville, IN 46060 / US | |||
05 /
Dale Delk, R. 1605 S. Stockport Drive Muncie, IN 47304 / US | |||
06 /
Ho, Jiaxiong Jason 5275 Ivy Hill Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
07 /
Earl, Robert 12598 Spring Violet Place Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
08 /
Heald, Brian 10337 Seagrave Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | |||
09 /
Bodensteiner, Richard 25 River Road North Haven, CT 06473 / US | |||
10 /
Burke, David 1931 Madison Ct. Carmel, IN 46032 / US | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010661.6 | 02.12.1998 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | US19970985840 | 05.12.1997 Original published format: US 985840 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1577669 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1577669 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, C12Q1/00, G01N27/30 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
Y10S435/817 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2005/38] | Title | German: | Verbesserte elektrochemische Biosensor-Teststreifen | [2005/38] | English: | Improved electrochemical biosensor test strip | [2005/38] | French: | Bandelettes reactives de biodetection electrochimique ameliorees | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/48] | 02.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/48] | Appeal following examination | 02.09.2008 | Appeal received No. T2202/08 | 12.11.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.09.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 06.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.09.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98960645.4 / EP1036320 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980960645) is 24.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3838033 (MINDT W, et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US4432366 (MARGULES GARY S [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US5502396 (DESARZENS PIERRE [CH], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [A]US5547702 (GLEISNER JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |