EP1609883 - Coated metal cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2017/38] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindholm, Mikael Duvbergsvägen 15b 143 44 Varby / SE | 02 /
Lagerquist, Mikael Rögr 23 194 55 Upplands-Väsby / SE | 03 /
Cullin, Frida N Stapeltorgsgatan 4a 803 20 Gävle / SE | 04 /
Cedergren, Gunilla Furuvägen 6 811 36 Sandviken / SE | 05 /
Ljungberg, Ann-Britt Karlbergsvägen 8 4 tr 113 27 Stockholm / SE | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Hansson, Hans Martin, et al Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 05010710.1 | 18.05.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | SE20040001636 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: SE 0401636 | SE20040001637 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: SE 0401637 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1609883 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1609883 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1609883 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/04, B22F5/00, C23C28/00, C23C30/00, C22C29/08 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
B23B27/14 (KR);
C22C29/08 (EP,US);
C23C16/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/042 (EP,US);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C23C28/42 (EP,US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24628 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/12] | C23C16/00, C23C16/30, C23C30/00, C23C28/00, C22C29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2005/52] | C23C16/00, C23C16/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/38] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beschichtetes Schneidwerkzeug | [2005/52] | English: | Coated metal cutting tool | [2005/52] | French: | Outil de coupé revêtu | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2005 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | IE | 18.05.2018 | LU | 18.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.05.2005 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1455003 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]SE0300175 (SANDVIK AB) [PX] 1-10 * page 8, line 27 - line 37 * * page 13, line 17 - line 31 * * claims 1-9 * * figures 1,2.2-2.3,3 *; | [A]US2002187370 (YAMAGATA KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 9 - paragraph 12 * * page 2, paragraph 19 - paragraph 23 * * page 3, paragraph 30 - paragraph 34 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP1348779 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 4 - paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 16 - paragraph 27 * * claims 1-11 *; | [A]US5786069 (LJUNGBERG BJORN [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 52 * * claims 1-28 * |