EP1598634 - Position sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2007/28] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terui, Kyuichiro Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kazuhiko Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010878.6 | 19.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040150569 | 20.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004150569 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598634 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598634 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598634 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/30, G01D5/16, G01D11/24 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP);
G01D11/245 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | G01B7/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/39] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Positionssensor | [2005/47] | English: | Position sensor | [2005/47] | French: | Capteur de position | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 26.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4920784 (GONSIOR WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1* column 1, line 66 - column 6, line 25 *; | [A]US5375333 (HECHT HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 38 - column 6, line 6 *; | [A]US5609184 (APEL PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 33 - column 11, line 6 *; | [A]US6198185 (BRUHN RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 26 *; | [A]EP1367359 (NILES PARTS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0069] * |