EP1598147 - Vitrified bond grindstone and manufacturing process thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Disco Corporation 13-11, Omori-Kita 2-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8580 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Disco Corporation 13-11, Omori Kita 2-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8580 / JP | ||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Disco Corporation 13-11, Omori-Kita 2-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8580 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekiya, Shinnosuke Disco Corporation 13-11, Omori-Kita 2-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8580 / JP | 02 /
Iwaoka, Teiji Disco Corporation 13-11, Omori-Kita 2-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8580 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010907.3 | 19.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040150003 | 20.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004150003 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598147 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598147 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598147 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/18, B24D7/06, C03C11/00, C03C14/00, C09K3/14 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
B24D7/066 (EP,KR);
B24D3/18 (EP,KR);
B24D18/0009 (KR);
B24D18/0072 (KR);
C03C11/007 (EP);
C03C14/004 (EP);
C09K3/1463 (EP);
C03C2214/04 (EP);
C03C2214/05 (EP);
C03C2214/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | B24D7/06, B24D3/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2007/11] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Keramisch gebundene Schleifscheibe und Herstellungsverfahren derselben | [2005/47] | English: | Vitrified bond grindstone and manufacturing process thereof | [2005/47] | French: | Meule à liant vitrifié et son procédé de fabrication | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2003136410 ; | [Y]US2248990 (ALLEN HEANY JOHN) [Y] 1-3 * claim 1 * * page 2, column 2, line 50 - line 53; figure 10 * * page 3, column 1, line 41 - line 43 * * page 2, column 1, line 50 - line 59 * * claim 3 *; | [A]US4541842 (ROSTOKER DAVID [US]) [A] 1-3* column 4, line 45; figure 2 *; | [A]US5203886 (SHELDON DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 6, lines 31-43 * * column 5, line 1 - line 15; claim 14 *; | [Y]US5738697 (WU MIANXUE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, line 23 - line 41 * * column 5, line 18 - line 19 * * column 2, line 35 - line 38 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030903), vol. 2003, no. 09, & JP2003136410 A 20030514 (ALLIED MATERIAL CORP) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * |