EP1726621 - Thermosetting powder compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTEC SURFACE SPECIALTIES, S.A. Square Marie Curie 11 1070 Bruxelles / BE | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moens, Luc Ijsvogellaan 30 St. Genesius Rode / BE | 02 /
Knoops, Nele Tidonksesteenweg 31/1 3020 Herent / BE | 03 /
Maetens, Daniel Avenue René Comhaire 108 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Destryker, Elise Martine CYTEC Surface Specialties, S.A. IPD Allée de la Recherche, 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Destryker, Elise Martine CYTEC Surface Specialties, S.A. IPD Allée de la Recherche, 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 05011415.6 | 26.05.2005 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726621 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C09D167/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (KR);
B05D1/02 (KR);
B05D3/0254 (KR);
C08J7/04 (KR);
C08J7/08 (KR);
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2467/00 (KR);
C08J2467/02 (KR);
C08K5/0025 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (EP,US);
C08L33/068 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C09D167/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D167/02, C08L2666/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/31] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmehärtbare Zusammensetzungen | [2006/48] | English: | Thermosetting powder compositions | [2006/48] | French: | Compositions pulverulentes thermodurcissables | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/07] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.07.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.07.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2244060 (COURTAULDS COATINGS [GB]) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 2 - page 19, line 24; claims 1-29 *; | [X]US2003153640 (MOENS LUC [BE], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0089]; examples 1-36; claims 1-21 *; | [E]EP1553148 (SURFACE SPECIALTIES SA [BE]) [E] 1-14* paragraphs [0001] - [0036]; examples 1-20; claims 1-9 * |