EP1609665 - Sleeve for a head rest with tolerance compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITW Automotive Products GmbH & Co. KG Liegnitzer Strasse 1 58642 Iserlohn / DE | [2009/35] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states ITW Automotive Products GmbH & Co. KG Erich-Nörrenberg-Strasse 7 58636 Iserlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gans, Matthias Keltenstrasse 11 97957 Wittinghausen / DE | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011472.7 | 27.05.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | DE20042009769U | 22.06.2004 Original published format: DE 202004009769 U | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1609665 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1609665 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1609665 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/48 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
B60N2/80 (EP,US);
B60N2/897 (EP,US);
B60N2205/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2010/34] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Führungshülse für Kopfstütze mit Toleranzausgleich | [2005/52] | English: | Sleeve for a head rest with tolerance compensation | [2005/52] | French: | Manchon de guidage pour appui-tête avec compensation de tolérance | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.08.2011 | [2012/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3323229 (BUTZ EUGEN OTTO) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4409557 (ITW ATECO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-2* abstract *; | [A]DE19841648 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]US6454356 (YAMADA NOBUO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 11, line 36 - column 13, line 3; figures 1-4,7-9 * |