EP1612034 - Method for forming a green tread rubber and a pneumatic tire formed by using the greeen tread rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Ikuji c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011519.5 | 27.05.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | JP20040190046 | 28.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004190046 | JP20040305565 | 20.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004305565 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612034 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612034 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/52, B29D30/58, B60C11/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B29D30/60 (EP,US);
B29D30/62 (EP,US);
B60C11/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Laufflächenrohlings und mit dem Laufflächenrohling hergestellter Luftreifen | [2006/01] | English: | Method for forming a green tread rubber and a pneumatic tire formed by using the greeen tread rubber | [2006/01] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une bande crue de roulement ainsi qu'un pneumatique utilisant cette bande crue de roulement | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000094542 ; | [A]JPH07290595 ; | [A]JPS5465750 ; | [A]GB1318755 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 30; figures 1,2; claims 1,8,9 *; | [A]EP1199192 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0031] - [0036]; figures 1,3; claims 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000094542 A 20000404 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [X] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07290595 A 19951107 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790725), vol. 003, no. 087, Database accession no. (C - 053), & JP54065750 A 19790526 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |