EP1605405 - Procedure for the determination of movement vectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [2008/13] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheffler, Günter Carl-Orff-Bogen 83 80939 München / DE | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Herzog-Wilhelm-Str. 26 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Mozartstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011609.4 | 30.05.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | DE20041026597 | 01.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004026597 | [2005/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1605405 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605405 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
H04N19/521 (EP,US);
G06T7/223 (EP,US);
H04N19/513 (EP,US);
H04N19/55 (EP,US);
H04N19/57 (EP,US);
H04N19/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/34] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung von Bewegungsvektoren, die Bildbereichen eines Bildes zugeordnet sind | [2005/50] | English: | Procedure for the determination of movement vectors | [2005/50] | French: | Procédé pour la détermination des vecteurs de mouvement | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 15.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0466981 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 15 *; | [A]US5557341 (WEISS PETER [SE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 3 - line 55 *; | [A]US5790207 (JUNG HAE-MOOK [KR]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 60 *; | [A] - ALPARONE L ET AL, "ADAPTIVELY WEIGHTED VECTOR-MEDIAN FILTERS FOR MOTION-FIELDS SMOOTHING", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING - PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ATLANTA, MAY 7 - 10, 1996, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING - PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960507), VOL. 4 CONF. 21, ISBN 0-7803-3193-1, pages 2267 - 2270, XP000681684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1996.545874 |