EP1601098 - RF generator with commutation inductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IXYS CORPORATION 3540 Bassett Street Santa Clara California 95054 / US | For all designated states HÜTTINGER Elektronik GmbH + Co. KG Bötzinger Strasse 80 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2009/27] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states IXYS CORPORATION 3540 Bassett Street Santa Clara California 95054 / US | ||
For all designated states HÜTTINGER Elektronik GmbH + Co. KG Bötzinger Strasse 80 79111 Freiburg / DE | |||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states IXYS CORPORATION 3540 Bassett Street Santa Clara California 95054 / US | ||
For all designated states Hüttinger Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Elsässer Strasse 8 79110 Freiburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states IXYS CORPORATION 3540 Bassett Street Santa Clara California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coleman, Charles 3243 Frenwood Lane Fort Collins Colorado 80525 / US | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011632.6 | 30.05.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | US20040575435P | 28.05.2004 Original published format: US 575435 P | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601098 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601098 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/217, H05H1/36, H05H1/46 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H02M7/5387 (EP,US);
H05K7/20927 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Title | German: | HF Generator mit Schaltspule | [2005/48] | English: | RF generator with commutation inductor | [2005/48] | French: | Générateur RF à inducteur de commutation | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 27.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | IT | 01.07.2009 | LT | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | ES | 12.10.2009 | IS | 01.11.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6072362 (LINCOLN DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1* figure 7 *; | [X]US6133788 (DENT PAUL WILKINSON [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6246599 (JANG YUNGTAEK [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-16 * column 1, lines 1-32; figures 3,10 * * column 3, lines 22-50 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 10 *; | [X]US6469919 (BENNETT PAUL GEORGE [GB]) [X] 1-6,8-16 * column 5, line 44 - column 7, line 32; figures 4,5,8,18-21,29 * * column 9, line 39 - column 10, line 54 * * column 13, line 65 - column 15, line 8 * * column 17, line 33 - column 18, line 4 * |