EP1604877 - Vehicle turning motion control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2011/01] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishimoto, Takeshi 1-1-17-307, Fukaminishi Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-0018 / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011960.1 | 02.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | JP20040167915 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004167915 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604877 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604877 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/1755 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T2201/122 (EP,US);
B60T2201/16 (EP,US);
B60T2210/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | B60T8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kurven-Regelvorrichtung und -verfahren für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2005/50] | English: | Vehicle turning motion control | [2005/50] | French: | Système et méthode pour règler le mouvement d'un véhicule automobile en virage | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5315295 (FUJII YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,11-13 * figures 8,9 *; | [XY]US6212465 (SIELAGOSKI GERALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-13 * figures 3-5 * * claims 1,2,6 * [Y] 9,10; | [Y]DE10119907 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * claims 1,8,9 *; | [A]US6564138 (SCHMITT JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 2-9* claims 1,4 *; | [X]US2003163238 (MATSUMOTO SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * figures 3-5 * |