EP1616865 - Inhibition of p38 kinase using symmetrical and unsymmetrical diphenyl ureas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2009/32] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06516 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Scott 2727 Nelson Road, AptM-301 Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 02 /
OSTERHOUT, Martin 2612 Clark Ave. Raleigh, North Carolina 27607 / US | 03 /
DUMAS, Jacques 98 Farmview Road Bethany, Connecticut 06542 / US | 04 /
KHIRE, Uday 411 Ridge Road Orange, Connecticut 06477 / US | 05 /
Lowinger, Timothy 53 Ironwood Road Guilford, Connecticut 06347 / US | 06 /
Scott, William J. 210 Saddle Hill Drive Guilford, Connecticut 06347 / US | 07 /
Smith, Roger A. 65 Winterhill Road Madison, Connecticut 06443-1901 / US | 08 /
Wood, Jill E. 3007 Ridge Road North Haven, Connecticut 06473 / US | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
MILLER, Scott 2727 Nelson Road, AptM-301 Longmont, CO 80503 / US | ||
02 /
OSTERHOUT, Martin 3217 Quiet Mill Road Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US | |||
03 /
DUMAS, Jacques 98 Farmview Road Bethany, Connecticut 06542 / US | |||
04 /
KHIRE, Uday 411 Ridge Road Orange, Connecticut 06477 / US | |||
05 /
Lowinger, Timothy 53 Ironwood Road Guilford, Connecticut 06347 / US | |||
06 /
Scott, William J. 210 Saddle Hill Drive Guilford, Connecticut 06347 / US | |||
07 /
Smith, Roger A. 65 Winterhill Road Madison, Connecticut 06443-1901 / US | |||
08 /
Wood, Jill E. 3007 Ridge Road North Haven, Connecticut 06473 / US | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012144.1 | 22.12.1998 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | US19970955749 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: US 955749 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616865 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D273/00, C07D275/00, A61K31/17, C07D333/20, C07D233/70, C07D213/70, C07D209/88, C07C317/42, C07C275/36, C07C205/57, A61K31/44, A61K31/535, A61K31/425, A61K31/40, C07D207/26, C07D207/40, C07D213/53, C07D231/08, C07D277/68, C07D209/76, C07D213/68, C07D233/22, C07D307/20, C07C275/34, C07C311/48 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
C07D207/27 (EP);
A61K31/17 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/403 (EP);
A61K31/4035 (EP);
A61K31/425 (EP);
A61K31/428 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/4402 (EP);
A61K31/4406 (EP);
A61K31/4409 (EP);
A61K31/4436 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/535 (EP);
A61K31/5375 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C205/11 (EP);
C07C205/22 (EP);
C07C205/37 (EP);
C07C205/38 (EP);
C07C205/57 (EP);
C07C205/58 (EP);
C07C275/30 (EP);
C07C275/34 (EP);
C07C275/36 (EP);
C07C275/40 (EP);
C07C275/42 (EP);
C07C309/88 (EP);
C07C311/48 (EP);
C07C317/42 (EP);
C07D207/26 (EP);
C07D207/404 (EP);
C07D209/76 (EP);
C07D209/86 (EP);
C07D209/88 (EP);
C07D213/40 (EP);
C07D213/53 (EP);
C07D213/68 (EP);
C07D213/70 (EP);
C07D231/08 (EP);
C07D233/22 (EP);
C07D233/70 (EP);
C07D263/58 (EP);
C07D277/68 (EP);
C07D295/185 (EP);
C07D307/20 (EP);
C07D333/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | 06.06.2005 | LT | 06.06.2005 | LV | 06.06.2005 | MK | 06.06.2005 | RO | 06.06.2005 | SI | 06.06.2005 | Title | German: | Hemmung der p38 Kinase unter Verwendung von symmetrischen und asymmetrischen Diphenylharnstoffen | [2006/03] | English: | Inhibition of p38 kinase using symmetrical and unsymmetrical diphenyl ureas | [2006/03] | French: | INHIBITION DE LA KINASE p38 PAR DES DIPHENYL-UREES SYMETRIQUES ET DISSYMETRIQUES | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 11.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.02.2008 | 05.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/13] | 25.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/13] | Appeal following examination | 18.04.2008 | Appeal received No. T1236/08 | 12.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.04.2011 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2011/16] | 19.07.2011 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2011/30] | 22.12.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 22.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.12.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98964221.0 / EP1042305 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980964221) is 31.07.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO9852558 (BAYER AG [US], et al) [XP] 1-22* page 76, line 17; examples 1-144; claim 1 * |