EP1607222 - Air management in a fluid ejection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2010/44] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hess, Jeffery S. 1015 SW 11th Street Corvallis OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Harding, Philip H. 5698 NW Dumbeck Ave. Albany OR 97321 / US | 03 /
Giri, Manish 8116 Daphne Ct. Corvallis OR 97330 / US | 04 /
Smith, Gilbert G. 7345 NW Madrone Way Corvallis OR 97330 / US | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012153.2 | 06.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | US20040872215 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: US 872215 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607222 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607222 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
B41J2/1433 (EP,US);
B41J2/07 (KR);
B41J2/1404 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14387 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/35] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Luftverwaltung in einem Flüssigkeitsausstossgerät | [2005/51] | English: | Air management in a fluid ejection device | [2005/51] | French: | Gestion de l'air dans un appareil à éjection de fluide | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.11.2010 | [2011/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01166963 ; | [X]US5394181 (BRAUN HILARION [US]) [X] 1-5,8-12,14-16,19,22,24-26,39,40 * the whole document *; | [X]US6120139 (CHILDERS WINTHROP [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10,12-18,24-30,33-35,37,38 * abstract * * column 7, line 56 - column 9, line 7 * * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 21 * * figures 7,9 *; | [X]EP1260372 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,10,19,22,39,40 * paragraphs [0026] - [0042] * * figures 2-5 *; | [X]EP1302323 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8-12,19,22,39,40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0056] * * figures 2-6 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890928), vol. 013, no. 434, Database accession no. (M - 875), & JP01166963 A 19890630 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-3,5-12,19,22,24,39,40 * abstract * |