EP1606996 - Aquarium arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Holding (US), Inc. 3001 Commerce Street Blacksburg Virginia 24060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Tetra Holding (US), Inc. 3001 Commerce Street Blacksburg Virginia 24060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agresta, Mark G. 100 Cherokee Drive Blacksburg, Virginia 24060 / US | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Miller, Andreas Miller Rechtsanwälte Kaiser-Joseph-Strasse 260 79098 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012385.0 | 09.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | US20040868749 | 15.06.2004 Original published format: US 868749 | US20050087327 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: US 87327 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606996 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01K63/00, A01K63/04, A01K63/06 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A01K63/006 (EP,US);
A01K63/045 (EP,US);
A01K63/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | Aquariumanordnung | [2005/51] | English: | Aquarium arrangement | [2005/51] | French: | Dispositif pour aquarium | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3149608 (MURPHY CLARENCE J) [X] 11,13-16,18-20 * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 13 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, lines 19-33 * * figures 4-7 *; | [A]US3892200 (RAMSAUER LARRY R) [A] 1,11,18 * column 3, lines 10-19,36-51 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 6 ** figures 1,5,8 *; | [A]US4006711 (FRANK MICHAEL G) [A] 1,11 * column 4, lines 24-64 * * column 5, lines 35-55 * * column 5, line 68 - column 6, line 16 * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]EP0616766 (NISSO IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 13 * * figure 1 * |