EP1639961 - Surgical anchoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Leibinger GmbH & Co. KG Bötzinger Strasse 41 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knöpfle, Christian Peter-Maier-Strasse 33 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Röthinger, Rainer c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012535.0 | 10.06.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | DE20041046414 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004046414 | [2006/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639961 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639961 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61C7/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A61C8/0031 (EP,US);
A61C7/00 (KR);
A61C7/12 (KR);
A61C7/285 (EP,US);
A61C8/0096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | Chirurgische Verankerungsvorrichtung | [2006/13] | English: | Surgical anchoring device | [2006/13] | French: | Dispositif d'ancrage chirurgical | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 19.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | IE | 06.05.2009 | LT | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | PL | 06.05.2009 | RO | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | AT | 10.06.2009 | LU | 10.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | IS | 06.09.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
AT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LU | 10.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
AT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LU | 10.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
AT | 10.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
AT | 10.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | LT | 06.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004057729 ; | [X]DE20310648U (LIN FU YI [TW]) [X] 1,4-7,10-14,19-21,23 * page 3, lines 7-14; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US2004147931 (DE CLERCK HUGO [BE]) [X] 1,4-7,10,15-18,21,22 * paragraphs [0056] , [0057]; figures 8-11 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004057729 A 20040226 (PLATON JAPAN:KK) [X] 1-4,10-14,19-22 * abstract * |