EP1621337 - Image recording material and lithographic printing plate precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inno, Toshifumi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Kunita, Kazuto c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2017/12] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
Inno, Toshifumi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | ||
02 /
Kunita, Kazuto Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/12] |
Former [2006/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012745.5 | 14.06.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | JP20040181139 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004181139 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621337 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621337 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, G03F7/00, G03F7/027, G03F7/028, G03F7/031 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
G03F7/029 (EP,US);
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
G03F7/002 (EP,US);
G03F7/027 (EP,US);
G03F7/028 (EP,US);
G03F7/031 (EP,US);
G03F7/0388 (EP,US);
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/06 (EP,US);
B41C2201/10 (EP,US);
B41C2201/12 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsmaterial und lithographischer Druckplattenvorläufer | [2006/05] | English: | Image recording material and lithographic printing plate precursor | [2006/05] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement d'images et précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2005 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | IE | 14.06.2017 | LU | 14.06.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.06.2005 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.06.2005 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4168982 (PAZOS JOSE F) [X] 1-3,7-10 * examples 5,8; claim 1 * * column 2, line 24 - line 65 *; | [A]EP1132200 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0140]; examples IV-1 *; | [X]JP2002202594 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0271] - paragraph [0272]; examples 1,10 * * example - *; | [A]EP1393899 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1491331 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,7-9 * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0179] * * page 16, line 10 - line 16 * | Examination | GB1453681 |