EP1607823 - Method and system for virus detection based on finite automata [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lionic Corporation 1F-C6, No. 1, Lising 1st Rd., Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2008/29] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Lionic Corporation 7F No. 178 Sec. 2, Gongdaowu Road Hsinchu 300 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Shi-Ming 2 F. No. 607, Sec.5, Zhongshan N. Rd. Shilin District, Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Chien, Shih-Wei No. 5, Lane 1281, Chung Jen Rd. Wufeng, Taichung / TW | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Weber, Joachim, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Weber, Joachim, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Weber, Joachim HOEFER & PARTNER Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012772.9 | 14.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | US20040868665 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 868665 | US20040868753 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 868753 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1607823 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1607823 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L29/06, G06F17/30 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
H04L63/1416 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/39] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Virusdetektion mittels finiter Automaten | [2005/51] | English: | Method and system for virus detection based on finite automata | [2005/51] | French: | Procédé et système pour la detection de virus à l'aide des automates finis | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP06018243.3 / EP1744235 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5319776 (HILE JOHN K [US], et al) [A] 4,5,16,18,28,33,34,41,42,49-52 * abstract * * column 8, line 51 - column 10, line 12 * * column 4, lines 7-22 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 21 ** figures 2,3 *; | [X]US5414833 (HERSHEY PAUL C [US], et al) [X] 4,5,16,18,28,33,34,41,42,49-52 * abstract * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 19 * * column 7, lines 33-40 * * column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 40 * * column 11, line 45 - column 12, line 33 * * column 26, lines 7-58 * * figures 2-12; claim 1 *; | [X]US5978801 (YUASA NATSUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-15,17,19-27,29-32,35-40,43-48 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 54 * * column 6, line 1 - column 9, line 15 * * figures 3-20 *; | [X]CA2307529 (PMC SIERRA INC [CA]) [X] 1-3,6-15,17,19-27,29-32,35-40,43-48 * abstract * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 26 * * page 8, line 14 - page 15, line 3 * * page 22, line 1 - page 23, line 21 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2002073330 (CHANDNANI ANJALI [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,6-15,17,19-27,29-32,35-40,43-48 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0065] * * figures 2-7 *; | [X]US2003123447 (SMITH BRIAN C [US]) [X] 1-3,6-15,17,19-27,29-32,35-40,43-48 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [PX]WO2004079571 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [PX] 1-3,6-15,17,19-27,29-32,35-40,43-48 * abstract * * page 11, lines 3-30 * * page 26, line 17 - page 28, line 8 * * page 46, line 21 - page 48, line 5 * * figures 1-5 * |