EP1608085 - Mobile terminal having satellite signal receiving antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Son, Hyun-Wung Dongbaek Woosung Apt. 1312-1203 Sanbon-Dong Gunpo Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012903.0 | 15.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | KR20040044210 | 15.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004044210 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608085 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1608085 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/10 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H01Q1/08 (EP,US);
H01Q1/084 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1264 (EP,US);
H01Q1/24 (KR);
H01Q1/244 (EP,US);
H01Q1/36 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät mit Empfangsantenne für Satellitensignal | [2005/51] | English: | Mobile terminal having satellite signal receiving antenna | [2005/51] | French: | Terminal mobile avec une antenne de réception des signaux émis par satellite | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/06] | 26.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.09.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2255448 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 11-16* the whole document *; | [A]GB2309830 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 17,18 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0800227 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 17,18 * claims 1-3,7,10 *; | [A]EP0993069 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]US6091972 (OGASAWARA SHINICHI [JP]) [A] 11-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1056220 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0141252 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,13-15,17,18 * page 5, lines 4-16 * * page 9, lines 1-9, paragraph 21 * * page 10, lines 12-14 * * page 12, lines 10-21 * * figures 3-6,13 *; | [A]US6476776 (KURBY CHRISTOPHER N [US]) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004022326 (MORRISH JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 7,16 * claim 3 *; | [X] - ETSI, "Satellite Earth stations and Systems (SES); Satellite- Digital Multimedia Broadcast system Service and Architecture; Draft ETSI TR 102 059", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20031201), vol. V0.0.2, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014041013 [X] 1-3,6,7,12 * pages 7,15,17 * | Examination | EP1408673 |