Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202005021167U | 12.04.2007 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202005021167 | 15.06.2005 | DE102004029409 | 18.06.2004 | EP05012926 | 15.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006026955 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004029409 | 18.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1607305 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2006 | A3 | EP1607305 | 21.12.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004029409 | 18.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2510071 | 18.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004029409 | 18.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1709757 | 21.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004029409 | 18.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004029409 | 05.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004029409 | 18.06.2004 |