EP1607305 - Pressurized fluid actuated positioning device, in particular for vehicle steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bögelein, Rolf Lohr 16 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012926.1 | 15.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | DE20041029409 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004029409 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1607305 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1607305 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/065 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
F15B11/0423 (EP,US);
B62D5/065 (EP,US);
B66F9/07568 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20515 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20561 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3051 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50527 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5059 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5154 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6336 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6656 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7054 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/05] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckmittelbetätigte Stelleinrichtung, insbesondere für eine Fahrzeuglenkvorrichtung | [2005/51] | English: | Pressurized fluid actuated positioning device, in particular for vehicle steering apparatus | [2005/51] | French: | Dispositif de positionnement actionné par fluide sous pression, notamment pour appareil de direction de véhicule | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/32] | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001001918 ; | [X]EP1162375 (HOERBIGER FLUIDTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,16-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002060104 (NAKAZAWA CHIHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,12,13,17-19* the whole document *; | [X]US2003178241 (YOKOTA TADAHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,18,19 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004195037 (OTAKI MIZUO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,12,13,16,18,19 * the whole document * * abstract * * paragraph [0010]; figure 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001001918 A 20010109 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [X] 1-4,6,12,13,18-23 * abstract * * the whole document * * paragraph [0002] * |