EP1736073 - Hair treatment applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desmond, Elizabeth Eileen 39 Heath Road, Southend Bradfield Reading, Berkshire RG7 6HQ / GB | 02 /
Gruzelier, Julian Richard John Pilgrims Croft, West Dean Sailsbury, Wiltshire SP5 1JN / GB | 03 /
Hayman, David Richard 19b Popesgrove Mansions, Heath Road Twickenham, Middlesex, TW1 4AX / GB | 04 /
Nmn Igbal, Osma 10 Waylen Street Reading, Berkshire, RG1 7UR / GB | [2009/14] |
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
Desmond, Elizabeth Eileen 39 Health Road, Southend Bradfield Reading, Berkshire RG7 6HQ / GB | ||
02 /
Gruzelier, Julian Richard John Pilgrims Croft, West Dean Sailsbury, Wiltshire SP5 1 JN / GB | |||
03 /
Hayman, David Richard 19b Popesgrove Mansions, Heath Road Twickenham Middlesex, TW1 4 AX / GB | |||
04 /
Nmn Igbal, Osma 10 Waylen Street Reading, Berkshire, RG1 7UR / GB | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Wella Service GmbH Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Wella Service GmbH Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Engisch, Gautier, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05013431.1 | 22.06.2005 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736073 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736073 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45D19/00 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
A45D19/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | |||
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 09.01.2007 | BA | 09.01.2007 | HR | 09.01.2007 | LV | 09.01.2007 | MK | 09.01.2007 | Title | German: | Auftragsvorrichtung zur Haarbehandlung | [2006/52] | English: | Hair treatment applicator | [2006/52] | French: | Applicateur de traitement capillaire | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2009 | BE | 12.08.2009 | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | DK | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | IT | 12.08.2009 | LT | 12.08.2009 | NL | 12.08.2009 | PL | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | TR | 12.08.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | ES | 23.11.2009 | IS | 12.12.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | HU | 13.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3960160 (HOGAN GARY LADON) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 68; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4566472 (MUELLER SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 24; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US6250312 (DASILVA DENIVALDO G [US]) [X] 1,8,9,11 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 51; figure -; claim - *; | [XA]US2003200619 (KELSEY STEVEN FREDERICK [GB], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0015]; figure -; claim - * [A] 9-11; | [DA]US2004065338 (COLACIOPPO KEITH [US], et al) [DA] 1-11* the whole document * |