EP1612080 - Hydrostatic mechanical power splitting transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGCO GmbH Johann-Georg-Fendt Strasse 4 87616 Marktoberdorf / DE | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heindl, Richard Carl-Orff-Ring 156 87616 Marktoberdorf / DE | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/01] | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited, P.O. Box 62, Banner Lane Coventry CV4 9GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05013444.4 | 22.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | GB20040014457 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0414457 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1612080 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1612080 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612080 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/04, F16H47/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
F16H47/04 (EP);
B60K17/04 (GB);
B60K17/105 (EP);
F16H47/00 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/36] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydrostatisch-mechanisches Leistungsverzweigungsgetriebe | [2006/01] | English: | Hydrostatic mechanical power splitting transmission | [2006/01] | French: | Transmission hydrostatique-mécanique à division de puissance | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0902213 ; | [A]US4019600 (MASTER RALPH E, et al); | [DY]DE4022049 (FENDT & CO XAVER [DE]); | [A]GB2254898 (KUBOTA KK [JP]); | [DA]DE4235728 (MEYERLE MICHAEL [DE]); | [A]DE19933822 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) |