EP1610230 - A method of annotating, retrieving and rendering a markup language document with digital ink annotations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Technology Corp. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashi, Ramanujan Wing A, Level 2, Tower I Cybercity Magarpatta City Hadapsar, Pune, 511028 / IN | 02 /
Ramachandran, Sriram 233 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge New Jersey NJ 07920-2331 / US | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013609.2 | 23.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | US20040877004 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: US 877004 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610230 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1610230 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/24 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G06F40/171 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F40/169 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/44] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Annotation, Wiederauffindung und Darstellung von Auszeichnungsprachedokumente mit digitalen Tinteannotationen | [2005/52] | English: | A method of annotating, retrieving and rendering a markup language document with digital ink annotations | [2005/52] | French: | Procédé d'annotation, recouvrement et affichage des documents de langage de balisage avec des annotations d'encre numérique | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 21.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/07] | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1016983 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-48 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0033] *; | [X] - RAMACHANDRAN ET AL, "An Architecture for Ink Annotations on Web Documents", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AD RECOGNITION (ICDAR '03), (2003), XP002464190 [X] 1-48 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDAR.2003.1227669 | [X] - BARGERON ET AL., "Reflowing Digital Ink Annotations", CHI 2003, Fort Lauderdale, FL, US, (20030405), pages 385 - 392, XP002464191 [X] 1-48 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/642611.642678 | [A] - DENOUE ET AL, "An annotation tool for Web browsers and its applications to information retrieval", PROCEEDINGS OF RIAO 2000, SIXTH CONFERENCE ON CONTENT BASED MULTIMEDIA INFORMATION ACCESS, Paris, FR, (200004), XP002464192 [A] 1-48 * the whole document * |