EP1614577 - Hydraulic system for actuation of a clutch of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/02] | Method of operation of a hydraulic system for actuation of a clutch of a motor vehicle | ||
[2008/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Luk Lamellen und Kupplungsbau GmbH Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nazari, Behzad, Dr. Alleenstrasse 19 2622 Nürtingen / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Duschl, Edgar Johannes LuK GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Duschl, Edgar Johannes LuK GmbH & Co. oHG Bussmatten 2 77815 Bühl / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013755.3 | 25.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | DE20041032988 | 08.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004032988 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1614577 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1614577 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/02, F16D25/08 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B60K23/02 (EP);
F16D25/08 (EP);
F16D2025/081 (EP);
F16D2500/5016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Systems zur Betätigung einer Kupplung eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [2008/10] | English: | Hydraulic system for actuation of a clutch of a motor vehicle | [2008/10] | French: | Système hydraulique pour l'actionnement d'un embrayage d'un véhicule automobile | [2008/10] |
Former [2006/02] | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines hydraulischen Systems zur Betätigung einer Kupplung eines Kraftfahrzeuges | ||
Former [2006/02] | Method of operation of a hydraulic system for actuation of a clutch of a motor vehicle | ||
Former [2006/02] | Procédé d'opération d'un système hydraulique pour l'actionnement d'un embrayage d'un véhicule automobile | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.07.2008 | CZ | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IE | 23.07.2008 | IT | 23.07.2008 | LT | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | PL | 23.07.2008 | RO | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | ES | 03.11.2008 | IS | 23.11.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | HU | 24.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19824480 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, lines 25-54 *; | [A]US6418717 (CHRISTIAENS YANNICK FRANK THEO [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, lines 23-48 *; | [A]WO03097422 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD USA [US]) [A] 1-4* pages 9,10 *; | [X]EP1433971 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figures 1,2 * |