EP1611874 - Slipper having low frequency generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beaunix Co., Ltd. 555-30 Baeksuk-dong Cheonan-shi / KR | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Jeong Hoon 703-901 Woosung Apt. 783-1 Jayang-dong Guangjin-gu Seoul / KR | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013772.8 | 27.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | KR20040049241 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004049241 | KR20050022770 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: KR 2005022770 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611874 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61H39/00, A61N1/32, A43B3/10 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A43B7/146 (EP,KR,US);
A43B3/101 (KR);
A43B3/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61H23/02 (KR);
A61H39/002 (EP,US);
A61N1/32 (EP,US);
A61N1/326 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Sandalen mit Niederfrequenzgenerator | [2006/01] | English: | Slipper having low frequency generator | [2006/01] | French: | Sandale ayant un générateur basses frequences | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 11.01.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4703445 (DASSLER ARMIN A [DE]); | [Y]EP0504715 (STAODYN INC [US]); | [Y]US5471405 (MARSH STEPHEN A [US]); | [Y]JP2000060978 (AISIN SEIKI); | [Y]US2003220578 (HO VINCENT B [US], et al); | [XY]US2004059386 (YU TSUNG-L [TW]); | [XPYP]US2004173220 (HARRY JASON D [US], et al) |