EP1650068 - Panel for sliding roof arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor GmbH Albert-Einstein-Strasse 14-20 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becher, Thomas Erfurter Strasse 34 63110 Rodgau / DE | 02 /
Böhm, Horst Offenbacher Landstrasse 537 60599 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 03 /
Grimm, Rainer Sachsenhäuser Landwehrweg 225 60588 Frankfurt / DE | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/17] | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013811.4 | 27.06.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | DE20041050811 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050811 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1650068 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1650068 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/02 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
B60J7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/27] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Deckel für ein Schiebedachsystem | [2006/17] | English: | Panel for sliding roof arrangement | [2006/17] | French: | Panneau pour la construction de toit ouvrant | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1291217 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0026]; figure 7 *; | [A]DE10143823 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]DE10253401 (ARVINMERITOR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * &US2005/0001457; paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE10002457 |