EP1615047 - Method for calibrating an optical distance sensor mounted on a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBEO Automobile Sensor GmbH Fahrenkrön 125 22179 Hamburg / DE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kämpchen, Nico Dullisbrunnen 35 89081 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Bühler, Matthias Schmiedebreite 13 89191 Nellingen / DE | 03 /
Dietmayer, Klaus, Prof. Dr. Alfred-Mendler-Weg 35 89075 Ulm / DE | 04 /
Lages, Ulrich, Dr. Bockhorster Höhe 113 21031 Hamburg / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013993.0 | 28.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | DE20041033114 | 08.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004033114 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1615047 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1615047 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/497, G05D1/02 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
G01S7/4972 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/4026 (EP,US);
G01S7/4086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/49] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kalibrierung eines optischen Abstandssensors an einem Fahrzeug | [2006/02] | English: | Method for calibrating an optical distance sensor mounted on a vehicle | [2006/02] | French: | Méthode de calibration d'un capteur optique de distance monté sur véhicule | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.11.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4973964 (SCHUSTER MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-12,14-18 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 45; figures 1-6; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE19902287 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-12,14-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10307263 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12,14-18 * figures 6-15 *; | [X]EP1355128 (SICK AG [DE]) [X] 1-12,14-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0014] - [0041] - [0044] - [0072] , [0082] - [0096]; figures 8-11 *; | [A]WO2004027347 (SNAP ON TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12,14-18* the whole document *; | [A]DE10356677 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12,14-18 * figures 3-10 * | by applicant | DE10143060 |