22.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
19.08.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
10.09.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
11.12.2009 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.02.2007 |
First examination report |
|
21.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.10.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
22.09.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
03.02.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
19.11.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |